U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue Other]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 18, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.