U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Byrd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.