U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirkland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.