U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 08, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.