U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fleming
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Service by Publication]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 29, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.