U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.