U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnhill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice-other]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 13, 2022: [Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • March 22, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • April 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.