U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez Benitez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • April 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.