U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.