U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Finch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 04, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.