U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:04-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Proposed Order]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 26, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.