U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • May 27, 2022: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • May 05, 2022: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
  • May 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.