U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • November 26, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 19, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.