U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment 2255]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
  • August 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • February 03, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.