U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRYANT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Cancelling Sentencing/Revocation Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Telephonic Notice]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion for Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.