U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TOWNES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Report ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.