U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EUBANKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 26, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 20, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.