U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BETHEA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.