U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROMO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.