U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAMMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.