U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHRISTIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.