U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEATH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • December 15, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 04, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
  • November 04, 2022: [Quash ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • September 22, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.