U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 15, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Arrest]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.