U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DALTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • October 05, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.