U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FREEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 18, 2022: [USPO PROB 12B - Modification to Conditions]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 04, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Discovery]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 06, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.