U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GADDY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.