U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VARGAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Disclosure ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • June 21, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.