U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CATES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.