U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OUTEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Order Re Petition for Rehearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Judgment 2255]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 16, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Declaration]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 09, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.