U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POLK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 27, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • April 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • April 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.