U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00405-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAVES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed ]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.