U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.