U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Onan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 25, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 29, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Expedite ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.