U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caudle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Expedite ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 03, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.