U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Medical Records]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 18, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • May 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 05, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 03, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.