U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 18, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 03, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.