U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puente
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 03, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Non-evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sealed Memorandum of Understanding]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 29, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 16, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 03, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 03, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.