U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. John
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Document]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Revoke]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.