U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 26, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.