U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hickman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • June 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Compel ]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.