U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elliott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 20, 2025: [Opinion from USCA]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2022: [Affidavit ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Document]
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Document]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2022: [Document]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 24, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 12, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 22, 2021: [Dismiss ]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.