U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vazquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 21, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 21, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 09, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.