U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joyner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice-other]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.