U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 16, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • January 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.