U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bender
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.