U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.