U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bainbridge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 19, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 16, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.