U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.