U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Bond ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.