U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eure
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Bond Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • March 27, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • January 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Brady Materials]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.